One trick is to round up or down to an easier calculation, and then subtract or add the difference. For example, I got 98 x 6. 100 X 6 is easier, so I did that first. Because I had gone up two to get to 100, I did 6 x 2, and subtracted 12 from 600.
Of course, you could always just do 90 x 6 plus 8 x 6.
this simple multiplication is made easier by taking an indirect route to the answers that arent obvious. for example, I take 48 x 4 and see it as 50 x 4 (which i automatically know is 200) minus 2 x 4 (8) and get the answer 192 in two seconds. But if I multiply 4 by 40 and then 4 by 8 and add them together it takes 2 or 3 times as long.
Weird, I like splitting the tens and ones columns, multiplying those, and adding them back together. Your method would take longer for me. Different minds!
16/20 on this try. I guess it depends a bit on how many easy ones you get too. The ones I didn't have time for were: 24x18, 14x23, 33x17 and 71x8. Yes, the last one of those would've been easy, but didnt spot it when doing others.
If thats your way to recognize me for doing in 1 month, the same quantity of points that you have done in like 2 years, your comment is really welcome.
Looks like we've got a lot of people coming in at around a minute and getting all 20. To me, that sounds like you could lop a minute off the time and still have a fun quiz, but with some time crunch.
Finished all of them with 2:29 left and I'm only 4 years old and have been diagnosed with severe, crippling autism. I'm also a small Indian child in Mumbai with no internet connection.
tough especially since I have memory issue because of my disease (often forget halfway a sentence what I was trying to say, and in the beginning i couldnt read anymore, cause after the second word I had forgotten the first. Reading got like 60% better, still cant focus at all. but math .. I allways get stuck after the first number even with the most basic stuff like 18+5 it took me several minutes sometimes, cause my mind was like a record being stuck, couldnt get past 18+....18+.....18+..... )
so extremely happy I finished this one with 100% the first go !! And actually quite surprised!
I took this test a long time ago and after lots of attempts, I finally got 100% doing it in all in my head in August 23, 2019. Fast forward to May 6 (7) 2020 and I got 100% on my first try with 1 minute left.
Was AFK and almost ran out of time but I came back with 2 mins left and thanks to my quick math skills (high school sucks but it's a valuable lesson) I beat it with 53 seconds left.
Let’s go I got it with 3.4 days left with no device. Been in my mom for a month. Mo mom is a rotten tomato in the back of the cabinet for some reason. I also have a concussion, Alzheimer’s, dementia, and a metal tablet stuck in my head. Blindfolded no hands or toes. Still got 178/20
Of course, you could always just do 90 x 6 plus 8 x 6.
We should do it better
Do you mean it is easier for you to calculate forty-five times thirteen than to calculate 45 x 13? jk
Who gets better?
Na, just 18/20 xD still first time tough...
Ok say your problem is 92x4. I would take
the first ten and the last one. ( so basically the distributive property,
Ex - 90x4 ( 360 ). Then add the ones. ( 2x4 ) your answer is 368
45*11=45*10+45*1=450+45=495
We need more people like that.
:smirk:
( 20 - 2 ) x 25 =
( 20 x 25 ) - ( 2 x 25 ) =
500 - 50 =
450
18 x 25 =
18 x 25 x 1 =
18 / 2 x 25 x 2 =
9 x 50 =
9 x 5 x 10
18/4 x 100
2 + 2 =
2 + ( 1 + 1 ) =
( 2 + 1 ) + 1 =
3 + 1 =
4
If you practice this enough you will
be able to know the answer right away.
Please humans, try to stay up on all the latest. We are only here to help you.
so extremely happy I finished this one with 100% the first go !! And actually quite surprised!
Everybody thinking they above average looks like me is below sad sad
Keep up the good work!
Example: 82 x 9
80 x 9 + 2 x 9
80 x 9 = 8 x 9 (72) x 10 = 720
2 x 9 = 18
720 + 18 = 738
82 x 9 = 738!